Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues-François de Regnault-Bellescize

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1732BornBelcize
29 May 177543.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
25 Jun 177543.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
20 Sep 179664.7DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Hugues-François de Regnault-Bellescize:
Bishop Hugues-François de Regnault-Bellescize (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

  • a bishop for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013