Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Bernard Collin de Contrisson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Laon

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1722BornLigny en Barrois
13 Mar 177552.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Laon, France
13 Mar 177552.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
2 Apr 177552.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
7 Dec 178967.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Bernard Collin de Contrisson:
Bishop Charles-Bernard Collin de Contrisson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Laon

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015