Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Panfilo Antonio Mazzara

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1721³BornSulmona
30 Nov 17265.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 174928.2AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
1 May 174928.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
30 Aug 176645.5DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Panfilo Antonio Mazzara:
Bishop Panfilo Antonio Mazzara (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1763
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013