Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Silvestri

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1692BornCingoli
19 Apr 172229.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 174653.9AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
8 May 174653.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
22 Jul 175462.1AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
12 Apr 176269.8DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Silvestri:
Bishop Giacinto Silvestri (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 307, and Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1746, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015