Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virgilio Giannotti

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1671BornCittà di Castello
22 May 171746.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 171746.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 174775.9AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
23 May 174776.0Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
16 Apr 175179.9DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Virgilio Giannotti:
Bishop Virgilio Giannotti (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1751
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015