Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federigo Muschi

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1684³BornSaccovescio
18 Jun 170723.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 174965.0AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
1 May 174965.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Oct 175571.5DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federigo Muschi:
Bishop Federigo Muschi (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015