Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Lancellotti, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1704BornNapoli
9 Feb 172722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
5 May 174945.2AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
11 May 174945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
18 Jan 176661.9DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Lancellotti:
Bishop Giuseppe Lancellotti O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Isola

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013