Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio de São José Moura Marinho, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1704BornVianna do Minho, Portugal
21 Sep 172824.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
26 Sep 172824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
2 Oct 175551.6SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
19 Jul 175652.4ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
21 Sep 175652.5Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
1 Jun 177874.2SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
20 Jul 177874.4ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
9 Aug 177975.4DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de São José Moura Marinho:
Archbishop Antônio de São José Moura Marinho O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268, and Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016