Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel do Cenáculo Villas Boas, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1724Born
4 Apr 174723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
5 Mar 177046.0SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
6 Aug 177046.4ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
28 Oct 177046.6Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
16 Mar 180278.0SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
9 Aug 180278.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
26 Jan 181489.8DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary
Manuel do Cenáculo Villas Boas
Archbishop Manuel do Cenáculo Villas Boas T.O.R.
(born , died )
Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace of Ajuda, Chapel, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 21 May 2025