Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Inácio de São Caetano, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Penafiel

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1719BornChaves
6 Jan 173616.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
1743¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
5 Mar 177050.5SelectedBishop of Penafiel, Portugal
17 Jun 177151.8ConfirmedBishop of Penafiel, Portugal
10 Nov 177152.2Ordained BishopBishop of Penafiel, Portugal
9 Dec 177859.3ResignedBishop of Penafiel, Portugal
14 Dec 177859.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
29 Nov 178869.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Penafiel, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Inácio de São Caetano:
Archbishop Inácio de São Caetano O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Penafiel

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 339, and Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015