Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolau Joaquim Torel da Cunha Manuel

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1712³BornLisboa
30 Aug 173926.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Sep 173926.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 177158.6SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
17 Jun 177158.7ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
17 Nov 177159.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
26 Jul 177259.8DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolau Joaquim Torel da Cunha Manuel:
Bishop Nicolau Joaquim Torel da Cunha Manuel (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015