Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso-Maria di Donato, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi)

Titular Bishop of Cardicium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1783BornNeapel
182037.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
9 Sep 183148.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
1835¹52.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
12 Jul 183552.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
21 Sep 184360.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
2 Mar 184461.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
20 May 184865.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso-Maria di Donato:
Bishop Alfonso-Maria di Donato O.F.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi)

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013