Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ephysius Chiais, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi)

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1808BornCasolino-Serralunga, Italy
182314.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Feb 184638.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
24 Feb 184638.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
24 Jan 184738.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
20 May 184840.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
12 Apr 188476.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China

MicroData Summary for Ephysius Chiais:
Bishop Ephysius Chiais O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi)

  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013