Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste Ferréol, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1808Born
14 Aug 184334.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corea
14 Aug 184334.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
31 Dec 184335.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
3 Feb 185344.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste Ferréol
Bishop Jean-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste Ferréol M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Corea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCucuron, France

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 108
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017