Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Theodor Fortunatus Spruit, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Luanfu, China

Titular Bishop of Vaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1880Born
189918.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 190625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Dec 192747.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luanfu, China
22 Dec 192747.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
25 Apr 192847.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
12 Jul 194363.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Luanfu, China

MicroData Summary for Anton Theodor Fortunatus Spruit
Bishop Anton Theodor Fortunatus Spruit O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Luanfu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOudewater, Diocese of Haarlem, Netherlands
Ordained BishopLuan, Vicariate Apostolic of Luanfu
Death PlaceTaiyüanfu

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 21
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast