Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Hubertus Schraven, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding]

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1873BornLottum, Netherlands
30 Sep 189421.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
17 Dec 189825.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
28 May 189925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
3 Dec 192047.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
16 Dec 192047.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
10 Apr 192147.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
9 Oct 193764.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding], China

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Hubertus Schraven:
Bishop Franciscus Hubertus Schraven C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding]

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 52
  • c3: CB, 8 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014