Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hubertus Hermens, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Denpasar, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1904Born
19 Jul 195046.3AppointedPrefect of Denpasar, Indonesia
2 Jan 196156.7ResignedPrefect of Denpasar, Indonesia
13 Feb 198782.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Denpasar, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Hubertus Hermens
Father Hubertus Hermens S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Denpasar

EventPlace
Death PlaceLela, Hospital

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast