Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cornelis Heiligers, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Missionaries of the Company of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1909Born
1928²18.1EnteredMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
8 Sep 192919.8First VowsMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
8 Sep 193424.8Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
16 Mar 193525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
1958²48.1AppointedSuperior General of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
1969²59.1CeasedSuperior General of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
20 Sep 197565.8DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Missionaries of the Company of Mary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelis Heiligers
Father Cornelis Heiligers S.M.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Missionaries of the Company of Mary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaarlem, Diocese of Haarlem, Netherlands
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast