Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frédéric Marie Blessing, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bondo

Titular Bishop of Thois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1886BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
2 Jun 191730.4Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
9 Jan 193043.0AppointedPrefect of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Dec 193750.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thois
2 Dec 193750.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Mar 193851.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thois
Oct 1954³67.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Aug 196275.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Marie Blessing:
Bishop Frédéric Marie Blessing O.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bondo

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015