Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sun Yuanmo

Deceased

Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1920Born
1949¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
1982²61.0SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China
12 Feb 198261.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China
28 Feb 199170.2InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China
21 Dec 199171.0SucceededBishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China
23 Feb 200685.2DiedBishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sun Yuanmo
Bishop Joseph Sun Yuanmo (born , died ) Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHungtung, Diocese of Hongdong [Hungtung]

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,123
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast