Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Zheng Shouduo

Deceased

Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1917Born
13 Mar 194931.9Ordained PriestPriest
1982²64.7SelectedBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
23 Sep 198265.5Ordained BishopBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
13 Mar 199173.9AppointedBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
16 Jul 200689.3DiedBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Zheng Shouduo
Bishop Augustin Zheng Shouduo (born , died ) Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaiyuan
Death PlacePoli/ Xinjiang City

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast