Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Alberto Arduino, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1909BornFoglizzo Canavese
9 Jul 193324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Apr 194839.1AppointedBishop of Shaoguan [Shiuchow], China
29 Jun 194839.3Ordained BishopBishop of Shaoguan [Shiuchow], China
21 Oct 196253.6AppointedBishop of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
18 Jun 197263.3DiedBishop of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Alberto Arduino:
Bishop Michele Alberto Arduino S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi)

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013