Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Batista Marchesi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Prelate Emeritus of Rio Negro, Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Coela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1889BornVilla di Serio, Italy
9 Apr 191626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 May 196272.9AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil
21 May 196272.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Coela
24 Aug 196273.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coela
13 Jun 196778.0RetiredCoadjutor Prelate of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil
3 Jun 198090.9DiedCoadjutor Prelate Emeritus of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joćo Batista Marchesi:
Bishop Joćo Batista Marchesi S.D.B. (born , died ) Coadjutor Prelate Emeritus of Rio Negro

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013