Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Zhu Kai-min (Chu or Tsu Kai-min), S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Haimen [Haimen]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1868BornShanghai
188819.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
28 Jun 189829.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Aug 192657.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Haimen [Haimen], China
2 Aug 192657.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
28 Oct 192657.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
11 Apr 194677.4AppointedBishop of Haimen [Haimen], China
22 Feb 196091.3DiedBishop of Haimen [Haimen], China

MicroData Summary for Simon Zhu Kai-min (Chu or Tsu Kai-min):
Bishop Simon Zhu Kai-min (Chu or Tsu Kai-min) S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Haimen [Haimen]

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015