Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifacio Yeung Fuk-tseuk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Canton [Guangzhou]

Titular Bishop of Eguga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1878¹BornLay-kao-kiao
13 May 190627.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 193152.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canton [Guangzhou], China
26 Mar 193152.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
26 Jul 193152.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eguga
23 Feb 193859.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Canton [Guangzhou], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Yeung Fuk-tseuk:
Bishop Bonifacio Yeung Fuk-tseuk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Canton [Guangzhou]

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015