Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Delegation to Eastern Africa

Africae Orientalis

Established

To: Nunciature to Sudan



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Africa for the Missions
11 January 1930EstablishedDelegation to Africa for the Missions
Delegation to British Eastern and Western Africa
2 January 1947Name ChangedDelegation to Africa for the Missions Delegation to British Eastern and Western Africa
Delegation to Eastern Africa
23 September 1960SplitDelegation to British Eastern and Western Africa Delegation to Eastern Africa
Delegation to Central-Western Africa
15 May 1965EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa Nunciature to Zambia
19 June 1965EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa Nunciature to Kenya
21 May 1966EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa Nunciature to Malawi
2 September 1966EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa Nunciature to Uganda
19 April 1968EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa Nunciature to Tanzania
3 July 1969EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa (Sudan, the French Coast of the Afars and Issas, the Somali Republic, and part of the Arabian Peninsula) Delegation to Red Sea Region
1971SuppressedDelegation to Eastern Africa (suppressed)
29 April 1972EstablishedDelegation to Eastern Africa Nunciature to Sudan

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Africa for the Missions
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 448
  • Delegation to British Eastern and Western Africa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 39, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 17 Feb 2024