Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Rubio Repullés

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1919BornMontealegre del Castillo
22 May 194829.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 196445.5AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
15 Aug 196445.6Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
12 May 199576.3RetiredBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Jan 200081.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mauro Rubio Repullés:
Bishop Mauro Rubio Repullés (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salamanca

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013