Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Quintanilla Manzanares del Rosario, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1904BornBerceo, Spain
192015.3ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
11 Jun 192722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
10 Nov 194945.2AppointedBishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China
29 Jan 195045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China
21 Nov 197066.2DiedBishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh], China

MicroData Summary for Arturo Quintanilla Manzanares del Rosario:
Bishop Arturo Quintanilla Manzanares del Rosario O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Shangqiu [Kweiteh]

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013