Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Hoowaarts, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caozhou/Heze [Tsaochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1878Born
189314.4ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
24 Feb 190526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
12 Nov 193456.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tsaochowfu, China
12 Nov 193456.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
24 Feb 193556.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres
11 Apr 194667.7AppointedBishop of Caozhou/Heze [Tsaochow], China
24 Mar 195475.6DiedBishop of Caozhou/Heze [Tsaochow], China

MicroData Summary for Franz Hoowaarts
Bishop Franz Hoowaarts S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Caozhou/Heze [Tsaochow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBottrop, Germany

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017