Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Olbert, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1895Born
192024.1ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
13 May 192630.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Jul 194852.6AppointedBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China
3 Oct 194852.8Ordained BishopBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China
18 Nov 196469.0DiedBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China

MicroData Summary for Augustin Olbert
Bishop Augustin Olbert S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDossenheim, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
Ordained BishopTsingtao, Diocese of Qingdao [Tsingtao]
Death PlaceHeidelberg

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 106
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast