Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Schoppelrey, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sinyangchow, China

Titular Bishop of Calydon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1876Born
188912.2ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
28 Jan 190023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Dec 193357.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sinyangchow, China
13 Dec 193357.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
6 Jan 193457.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
25 May 194063.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Sinyangchow, China

MicroData Summary for Hermann Schoppelrey
Bishop Hermann Schoppelrey S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sinyangchow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMönchengladbach, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
Ordained BishopMödling
Death PlaceChumatien

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,934, Number 1
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast