Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Césaire Jean Schang (Shang), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale}, China

Titular Bishop of Vaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1835Born
8 Aug 185823.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 188044.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
4 Jul 188650.9Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
22 May 189458.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale}, China
22 May 189458.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
4 Oct 189459.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
9 Sep 191176.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale}, China

MicroData Summary for Césaire Jean Schang (Shang)
Bishop Césaire Jean Schang (Shang) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCappel, Diocese of Metz, France
Ordained BishopChefoo
Death PlaceChefoo

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 578
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,894, Number 53
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 931
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,109, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast