Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Maquet, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1843BornJuvigny-sur-Loison, France
6 Jun 186824.5Ordained PriestPriest
187228.1ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
31 Jul 190157.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China
31 Jul 190157.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
8 Dec 190158.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
23 Dec 191976.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China

MicroData Summary for Henri Maquet:
Bishop Henri Maquet S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013