Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Briva Mirabent

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1926Born
19 Mar 195024.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 196741.2AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Jul 196741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
20 Jun 199468.3DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Briva Mirabent
Bishop Antonio Briva Mirabent (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSitges

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast