Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Johann von Herberstein

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1719BornGraz
8 Jun 174323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
20 Nov 176950.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
20 Nov 176950.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
7 Jan 177050.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
28 Nov 177253.3SucceededBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
5 Dec 177253.4InstalledBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
7 Oct 178768.2DiedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Karl Johann von Herberstein:
Bishop Karl Johann von Herberstein (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249, and Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015