Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Heinrich von Kerens, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten

Bishop of Austria, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1725BornMaastricht, Netherlands
174014.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
17 Sep 175126.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
19 Sep 175126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Jul 176944.1SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
18 Dec 176944.5ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
21 Jan 177044.6Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
6 Nov 177348.4AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
6 Nov 177348.4SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
3 Apr 177549.8ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
3 May 177549.9InstalledBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
11 Oct 178459.3SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
28 Jan 178559.6ResignedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
14 Feb 178559.7ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
8 May 178559.9InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
26 Nov 179267.5DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Heinrich von Kerens
Bishop Johann Heinrich von Kerens S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016