Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Leopold von Hay

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1735BornFulnek
23 Sep 175823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
29 Jul 178045.3SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
11 Dec 178045.6ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
11 Mar 178145.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
1 Jun 179459.1DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Leopold von Hay:
Bishop Johann Leopold von Hay (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013