Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Maria Josef Artz von und zu Vasegg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1739³BornEinsberg
1 Sep 176526.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
22 Feb 176626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
28 Sep 177839.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
28 Sep 177839.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
13 Dec 177839.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
11 Mar 180565.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Maria Josef Artz von und zu Vasegg
Bishop Edmund Maria Josef Artz von und zu Vasegg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 361
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 396, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016