Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Lachenbauer, O.Cr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1741³Born
19 Mar 176322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
7 Apr 176423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
7 Dec 178645.8SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
29 Jan 178745.9ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
22 Apr 178746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
22 Feb 179958.0DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Lachenbauer
Bishop Johann Baptist Lachenbauer O.Cr. (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBroumov

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018