Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Bajzáth

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1720³BornEsztergom
10 Sep 174323.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 174323.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 177757.0SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
12 May 177757.2ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
22 Jun 177757.3Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
24 Feb 180282.0DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Bajzáth:
Bishop József Bajzáth (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015