Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Philipp von Inzaghi

Deceased

Bishop of Gorizia e Gradisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1731³BornGraz
16 Jun 175322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
30 Mar 175422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
27 Feb 177543.7SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
24 Apr 177543.9ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
2 Jul 177544.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
5 Jan 178856.6SelectedBishop of Gradisca (d’Isonzo), Italy
15 Dec 178857.5ConfirmedBishop of Gradisca (d’Isonzo), Italy
26 Apr 178957.9InstalledBishop of Gradisca (d’Isonzo), Italy
12 Sep 179160.2AppointedBishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
12 Feb 179260.7InstalledBishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
3 Dec 181685.5DiedBishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Philipp von Inzaghi:
Bishop Franz Philipp von Inzaghi (born , died ) Bishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228, and Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015