Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop László Kollonitz

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1736³BornVienna, Austria
10 Mar 175922.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Nov 175922.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 177538.2SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
24 Apr 177538.3ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
28 May 177538.4Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
23 Jun 178043.5SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
25 Jun 178144.5ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
21 Aug 178750.7SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
10 Mar 178851.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
23 Apr 181780.3DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Kollonitz:
Archbishop László Kollonitz (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 413
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015