Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ermest Amadeus Thomas von Attems

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1694Born
17 Dec 172429.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
2 Dec 173540.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
2 Dec 173540.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
15 Jan 173641.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
6 Oct 174247.7SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
17 Dec 174247.9ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
27 Mar 174348.2InstalledBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
5 Dec 175762.9DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Ermest Amadeus Thomas von Attems
Bishop Ermest Amadeus Thomas von Attems (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018