Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Joseph von Lamberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1687Born
2 May 172739.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 173345.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
5 Mar 173345.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
3 May 173345.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
27 Jan 174759.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
1757¹69.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Joseph von Lamberg
Bishop Anton Joseph von Lamberg (born , died 1757) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Bartholomaei, Ljubljana, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau
Death PlaceRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 260, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1733, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Sep 2020

Quantcast