Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismund Felix von Schrattenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1679³Born
25 Nov 170324.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
30 Nov 170324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
14 Jul 172748.5SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
26 Jan 172849.0ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
25 Feb 172849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
12 Jun 174263.4DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Felix von Schrattenbach
Bishop Sigismund Felix von Schrattenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeukirchen

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018