Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Aloysius von Lamberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1692³Born
21 May 172532.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 172533.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
19 Nov 172533.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
3 Feb 172633.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
15 Nov 173240.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Aloysius von Lamberg
Bishop Franciscus Aloysius von Lamberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau

  • a priest for 7.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 49
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Sep 2020

Quantcast