Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Ernest de Salm-Reifferscheid

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1698³BornVienna, Austria
27 Oct 172628.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 173133.4SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
3 Mar 173233.7ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
23 Mar 173233.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
16 Jun 177072.0DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Ernest de Salm-Reifferscheid:
Bishop François-Ernest de Salm-Reifferscheid (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015