Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Josephus Hubertus de Wavrans

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1717BornTournai
26 Feb 176244.5SelectedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
14 Jun 176244.8ConfirmedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
21 Nov 176245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
27 Oct 178467.2DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Felix Josephus Hubertus de Wavrans:
Bishop Felix Josephus Hubertus de Wavrans (born , died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1781
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015