Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Willem Antonius Brenart

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1730³BornLouvain
8 Jun 174312.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 174414.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 177746.2SelectedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
12 May 177746.4ConfirmedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
29 Jun 177746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
26 Oct 179463.9DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felix Willem Antonius Brenart:
Bishop Felix Willem Antonius Brenart (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1789
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016