Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph von Rabatta

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
166440.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
16 Apr 166440.2SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
23 Jun 166440.4ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
9 Nov 166440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
18 Feb 168359.1DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph von Rabatta
Bishop Joseph von Rabatta (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorizia
Ordained BishopLjubljana, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 213, and Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast